skip to content

Carriere, Christopher Gordon

CPSO#: 90956

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Nov 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 28 Nov 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 9999 Station Main
CFB Petawawa
Petawawa ON  K8H 2X3
Phone: 613 687 5511 Ext. 6809
Fax: 613 588 4880 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A1G8
Canada
Phone: 613-732-2811
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2018 Active
             Dr. Christopher Gordon Carriere may practise medicine independently in family
            medicine, only.