skip to content

Carrier, Benjamin-Benoit

CPSO#: 95812

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Ottawa Medical Clinic
2-1650 Queensdale Ave.
Ottawa, ON
K1T 1N8
Ottawa ON  K1T 1N8
Phone: (613)244-4400
Fax: 613-244-3399 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN-BENOIT CARRIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARRIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016