skip to content

Carr, Lindsay Anne

CPSO#: 88922

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

CMPA
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Canada
Phone: 613-725-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lindsay Carr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Carr ( CPSO# 88922 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room 206
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LINDSAY ANNE CARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2011