skip to content

Carmichael, Frederick James

CPSO#: 30970

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Oct 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Oct 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Carmichael Hood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Oct 2018