Carlson, Ryan George (CPSO#: 97906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Regional Cancer Program
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-6237
Fax: (705) 523-7323
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: 705-759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pearce, Andronowski and Want Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 6 2015


Corporation Name: Dr. R. G. Carlson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Carlson ( CPSO# 97906 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Regional Cancer Program
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-6237

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434


Corporation Name: Want and Carlson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 4 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN GEORGE CARLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2013