skip to content

Carlson, Pamela Sue

CPSO#: 96210

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 May 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dalby Family Practice
PO Box 3000
21 Hamilton Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone: 226-369-0264
Fax: 226-369-0246 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Groves Memorial Community Hospital
131 Frederick Campbell Street
Fergus ON  N1M 0H3
Canada
Phone: (519) 843-2010
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Upper Grand Family Health Team
107-6420 Beatty Line North
Fergus ON  N1M 2W3
Canada
Phone: (519) 843-3947
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Pamela S. Carlson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Carlson ( CPSO# 96210 )

Business Address:
131 Frederick Campbell Street
Fergus ON  N1M 0H3
Phone Number: 5198432010

Business Address:
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
21 Hamilton Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone Number: (226) 369-0264

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:03 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAMELA SUE CARLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 04 Jul 2011 to 17 Jul 2011
EL - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2013