skip to content

Carlson, Malcolm Lyle

CPSO#: 31113

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 28 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
28 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective:09 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Aug 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Sep 2021