skip to content

Carlos, Joseph Mercado

CPSO#: 27837

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jun 2015
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph M. Carlos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 24 Mar 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2015

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: June 15, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Carlos was referred to the Discipline Committee by Notice of Hearing dated November 13, 2014, on allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence. Effective June 15, 2015, Dr. Carlos has resigned from the College and has undertaken not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. Dr. Carlos does not admit the allegations. Given Dr. Carlos' resignation and undertaking, the College has withdrawn the Notice of Hearing.