skip to content

Carll, David John

CPSO#: 22781

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Jun 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1970
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 30 Oct 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 May 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Jul 2002
Summary:

 On July 9, 2002, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Carll guilty of professional misconduct in that 
 he engaged in conduct relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, in 
 that he sexually harassed 7 female health care professionals, failed to maintain the standard of 
 practice of the profession as well as sexual impropriety with respect to examinations of two 
 patients.

On September 13, 2002, the Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty:

1)	Dr. 
 Carll be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register
2)	Twelve (12) 
 month suspensioin, six (6) months of which to be suspended if Dr. Carll 	completes the College(s 
 boudary course.
3)	Costs to the College in the amount of $25,000.00


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 28 Sep 2004
Hearing Date(s): May 22, 2001