skip to content

Carlini, Ryan Joseph

CPSO#: 94473

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Apr 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 946-0160
Fax: (519) 258-2169 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

South West Detention Centre
4819 8th Concession Road RR#3
Maidstone ON  N0R 1K0
Canada
Phone: (519) 967-3100
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RYAN JOSEPH CARLINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2013