skip to content

Carey, Lewis Stafford De Sausmarez

CPSO#: 13792

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Dec 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Dec 1996

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 Mar 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1952
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1994
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Dec 1996