Carere, Matthew David (CPSO#: 99534)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College, Cork, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - DEM Office
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

566 Louise St.
Winchester ON  K0C2K0
Canada
Phone: 613-774-2420
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carere Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 18 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 21 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW DAVID CARERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARERE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2015