skip to content

Cardinal Cartier, Sandrine

CPSO#: 93982

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Feb 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3280 Bloor St West
Centre Tower, 8th floor
Suite #802
Toronto ON  M8X 2X3
Phone: (416) 926-2698
Fax: 416-324-7905 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

263 McCaul St
University of Toronto
Occupational Health - Environmental
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 1W7
Canada
Phone: 4169463289
Fax: 4169712014
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Paul Gibbons Gomez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cardinal Cartier ( CPSO# 93982 )
Dr. P. Gibbons Gomez ( CPSO# 94483 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANDRINE CARDINAL CARTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARDINAL CARTIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2016