skip to content

Cardella, Carl Joseph

CPSO#: 21358

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jun 1968
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
11 PMB 142
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4480
Fax: (416) 340-5244 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Cardella Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CARL JOSEPH CARDELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARDELLA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1968