skip to content

Caprara, Daniela Leda

CPSO#: 89483

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 112
2737 Keele Street
North York ON  M3M 2E9
Phone: (647) 347-8433
Fax: (647) 660-1800 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Daniela Caprara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Caprara ( CPSO# 89483 )

Business Address:
112 - 2737 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3M 2E9
Phone Number: (647) 347-8433

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIELA LEDA CAPRARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAPRARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013