skip to content

Caplan, David Jeffrey

CPSO#: 65455

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 1P1
Phone: 4167435853 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D. Caplan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 21 2012
Corporation Name: D J Caplan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Caplan ( CPSO# 65455 )

Business Address:
Unit 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 1P1
Phone Number: (416) 743-5853

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID JEFFREY CAPLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAPLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Rotating Internship

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993