skip to content

Cao, Rui Lily

CPSO#: 91175

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department Of Radiology
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carleton Place and
District Memorial Hospital
Department of Radiology
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: (613) 257-2200
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John C. Yu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yu ( CPSO# 71242 )
Dr. R. Cao ( CPSO# 91175 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Room 1C153
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000


Corporation Name: R.L. Cao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cao ( CPSO# 91175 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 266-1056

Business Address:
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1C4
Phone Number: (613) 680-8357

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RUI LILY CAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015