skip to content

Cao, Jing

CPSO#: 96993

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Nov 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:National University of Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 96
550 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Z4
Phone: (905) 707-8181
Fax: (905) 707-8180 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

549 Bur Oak Avenue
Markham ON  L6C 3E5
Canada
Phone: 9055540199
Fax: 9055544834
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jing Cao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cao ( CPSO# 96993 )

Business Address:
Unit 96
550 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Z4
Phone Number: (905) 707-8181

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:30 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JING CAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
PEAP - R - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 31 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2013