skip to content

Cantor, Elliott Jamie Ferdman

CPSO#: 91174

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 425
100 Richmond Street West
Toronto ON  M5H 3K6
Phone: (416) 360-8208
Fax: (416) 360-0692 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Elliott Cantor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Cantor ( CPSO# 91174 )

Business Address:
Suite 425
100 Richmond Street West
Toronto ON  M5H 3K6
Phone Number: (416) 360-8208

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELLIOTT JAMIE FERDMAN CANTOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANTOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011