Canton, Toni Jo (CPSO#: 94788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Feb 2013

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of California, San Diego, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Source Medical Clinic
C1 Ground Floor
473 Dupont Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1Y6
Phone: (416) 588-1888
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Feb 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Feb 2011 to 20 Feb 2011
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 May 2011 to 15 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2012 to 29 Apr 2012
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Aug 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Toni  Jo  Canton  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  family
                  medicine, only.