skip to content

Canton, Toni Jo

CPSO#: 94788

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Feb 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Feb 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of California, San Diego, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Source Medical Clinic
C1 Ground Floor
473 Dupont Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1Y6
Phone: (416) 588-1888 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Feb 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 07 Feb 2011 to 20 Feb 2011
EL - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 02 May 2011 to 15 May 2011
EL - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 09 Apr 2012 to 29 Apr 2012
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Aug 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014 Active
 Dr.  Toni  Jo  Canton  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  family
                  medicine, only.