skip to content

Cannon, Lesley Marie

CPSO#: 97557

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400 Ext. 5214 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lesley Cannon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Cannon ( CPSO# 97557 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:02 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LESLEY MARIE CANNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2014