skip to content

Canning, Aidan William Noel

CPSO#: 25353

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jun 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aidan Canning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 19 2013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ireland

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: November 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Aidan William Noel Canning to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 7, 2018:

Dr. Canning has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in any jurisdiction and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.