skip to content

Canil, Thomas Mariano

CPSO#: 100762

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Cardinal Carter North
30 Bond St
Rm 5-031
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. THOMAS MARIANO CANIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018