skip to content

Caners, Kyla Dawn Dunlop

CPSO#: 95459

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room 234
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76207 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

711 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C1
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 76207
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

690 Main St. West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A4
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 76207
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kyla Caners Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Caners ( CPSO# 95459 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room 234
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C1
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
690 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A4
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KYLA DAWN DUNLOP CANERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CANERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016