Cancelliere, Laura Antoinette (CPSO#: 100516)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Feb 2019

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Feb 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 15 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 15 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 16 Feb 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 15 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Feb 2019