skip to content

Camuglia, Anthony Charles James

CPSO#: 99761

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Monash University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 02 Jan 2013 to 15 Mar 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Mar 2013 to 01 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 2014