skip to content

Campigotto, Aaron James

CPSO#: 95690

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-1500 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AARON JAMES CAMPIGOTTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPIGOTTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016