skip to content

Campbell, William Donovan

CPSO#: 18504

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jun 1997

Summary

Date of Death: 12-Nov-2009

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 1997