skip to content

Campbell, Ryan Kennedy

CPSO#: 97903

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Dept of Medical Imaging
263 McCaul Street - 4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 1W7
Phone: 416 978 6801 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan K. Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Campbell ( CPSO# 97903 )

Business Address:
32 Canadian Forces Health Services
1 Yukon Lane
Toronto ON  M3K 0A1
Phone Number: (416) 633-6200

Business Address:
ACT Toronto
1288 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1M6
Phone Number: (416) 462-0228

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RYAN KENNEDY CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014