skip to content

Campbell, Laura Beth

CPSO#: 88442

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Psychiatry
4th Floor
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8056 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Laura B. Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Campbell ( CPSO# 88442 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Psychiatry
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURA BETH CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2013