skip to content

Campbell, Jeffrey Douglas

CPSO#: 98334

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor St
Room B4 - 656
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6087
Fax: 519 646-6037 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J.D. Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Campbell ( CPSO# 98334 )

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St. Josephs Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
B4-656
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6087

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEFFREY DOUGLAS CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2018