skip to content

Campbell, James Stewart

CPSO#: 14497

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 9-Oct-2002

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 19 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Aug 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993