skip to content

Campbell, Gregory John

CPSO#: 91449

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3a
1605 Orleans Boulevard
Orleans, Ontario
Ottawa ON  K1C7E2
Phone: (613) 841-8500
Fax: (613) 841-5310 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Orleans Urgent Care Centre
1220 Promenade Place D'Orleans
Ottawa ON  K1C 7K3
Canada
Phone: (613) 841-5389
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gregory J. Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Campbell ( CPSO# 91449 )

Business Address:
Chapel Hill Health Centre
3A-1605 Blvd Orléans
Orléans ON  K1C 7E2
Phone Number: (613) 841-8500

Business Address:
Orleans Urgent Care Clinic
100 - 1220 Promenade Place D'Orleans
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Phone Number: (613) 841-5389

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GREGORY JOHN CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011