skip to content

Campbell, Doreen Joyce

CPSO#: 27834

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 807
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 408-1010
Fax: (416) 408-2828 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 401
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 966-0178
Fax: (416) 929-0843
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:23 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:04 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DOREEN JOYCE CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1975