skip to content

Campbell, Craig Erskine

CPSO#: 30679

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 May 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 May 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone: (613) 729-1096
Fax: (613) 728-4480 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Craig E. Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Campbell ( CPSO# 30679 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 729-1096

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
7th Floor
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4573


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Bermuda

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CRAIG ERSKINE CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1979