skip to content

Campbell, Craig Erskine

CPSO#: 30679

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2020
EXPIRY DATE
31 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Craig E. Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Campbell ( CPSO# 30679 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 729-1096

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
7th Floor
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4573

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2020

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: October 23, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)