skip to content

Campagna, Craig

CPSO#: 98027

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 113
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 946-3361 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Craig Campagna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Campagna ( CPSO# 98027 )

Business Address:
2462 Howard Avenue
Unit 113
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 946-3361

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CRAIG CAMPAGNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPAGNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014