skip to content

Cameron, Nancy Elizabeth

CPSO#: 30255

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Apr 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 8 - 134 Mitchell Court Mitchell, ON N0K 1N0
Date Received: 19 May 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 12, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Nancy Elizabeth Cameron to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 12, 2017:

Dr. Cameron has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.