skip to content

Cameron, Kathryn Maureen

CPSO#: 90955

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue Louth
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647 Ext. 46412 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Maureen Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cameron ( CPSO# 90955 )

Business Address:
St Catharines Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue Louth
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHRYN MAUREEN CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 04 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 05 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014