skip to content

Cameron, James Albert

CPSO#: 33372

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Apr 1991
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
2148 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H1
Phone: (613) 596-0300
Fax: (613) 596-0848 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: James A. Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cameron ( CPSO# 33372 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
2148 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H1
Phone Number: (613) 596-0300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES ALBERT CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1991