skip to content

Cameron, Hugh Urquhart

CPSO#: 26228

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Oct 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of St. Andrews, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
43 Wellesley Street East
Suite 318
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone: (416) 967-8734
Fax: (416) 975-2679 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hugh U. Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 4 2014

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HUGH URQUHART CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1973