skip to content

Cameron, Douglas Alexander

CPSO#: 31705

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 06 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 May 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Douglas A. Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Health Record Services Princess Margaret Hospital 610 University Ave. Floor 3b, Room 202 Toronto, ON M5G 2M9 Phone: 416 946 4501 ext. 4711
Date Received: 07 May 2019


Instructions: Requests for medical records should be directed to the University Health Network's (Toronto General Division) medical record department
Date Received: 08 Jan 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 May 2019