Callery, Emily Christine (CPSO#: 99550)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Marmora Medical Centre
1 Madoc Street
PO Box 520
Marmora ON  K0K 2M0
Phone: 613-472-6131
Fax: 613-472-6135
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Community Health Centre
108 Angeline Street South
Lindsay ON  K9V 3L5
Canada
Phone: 705-879-4100
Fax: 705-324-8411
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily Callery Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Callery ( CPSO# 99550 )

Business Address:
Community Health Centre
108 Angeline Street South
Lindsay ON  K9V 3L5
Phone Number: (705) 879-4100

Business Address:
1 Madoc Street
PO Box 520
Marmora ON  K0K 2M0
Phone Number: (613) 472-6131

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY CHRISTINE CALLERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALLERY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2012 to 20 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2014