skip to content

Callaghan, William Bryan

CPSO#: 25792

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jul 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: W. Bryan Callaghan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Callaghan ( CPSO# 25792 )

Business Address:
200 - 139 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 9A5
Phone Number: (613) 721-6463

Business Address:
40 Parkland Cres
Nepean ON  K2H 7W5

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking access to their medical records can contact Docudavit Solutions:1-888-782-9083 or fax 416-398-5932
Date Received: 16 Apr 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLIAM BRYAN CALLAGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALLAGHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Sep 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1979