skip to content

Callaghan, Sarah

CPSO#: 99655

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2017