skip to content

Caine, Sean Patrick

CPSO#: 90031

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commussuibers Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 57956 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
RN 1NW-126
4001 Leslie St.
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 416-756-6165
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sean Caine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wilejto ( CPSO# 87863 )
Dr. S. Caine ( CPSO# 90031 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SEAN PATRICK CAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2008 to 14 Dec 2008
EL - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010