skip to content

Cagiannos, Ilias

CPSO#: 69081

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jun 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 71258
Fax: (613) 739-6860 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Cagiannos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Cagiannos ( CPSO# 69081 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4500

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Box 222
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 761-4221

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ILIAS CAGIANNOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAGIANNOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2002