skip to content

Caco, Christopher Carl

CPSO#: 32915

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Feb 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wilson Medical Centre
130 Wilson St
Hamilton ON  L8R 1E2
Phone: (905) 526-9744 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite B118
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C3E7
Canada
Phone: 416-469-6580 Ext. 6553
Fax: 416-469-6554
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

36 Vodden Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 4H4
Canada
Phone: 905-455-5455
Fax: 905-455-5154
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 21 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER CARL CACO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CACO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1986