skip to content

Toguri, Clare Tomiye

CPSO#: 103708

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
University of Toronto
12th Floor, 123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: 416-946-0926 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Allan Toguri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Toguri ( CPSO# 22871 )
Dr. D. Toguri ( CPSO# 96418 )
Dr. C. Toguri ( CPSO# 103708)

Business Address:
200 - 2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone Number: (416) 296-1911

Business Address:
Suite 411
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 439-8913

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CLARE TOMIYE TOGURI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. TOGURI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. TOGURI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TOGURI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. TOGURI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. TOGURI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. TOGURI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2020.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020